Data Map
According to the new Hunan client news, On November 4th, Yang Haodong, member of the Standing Committee of the Provincial Party Committee and Minister of the Propaganda Department of the Provincial Party Committee, investigated at the Provincial Party Committee's Network Information Office.Improve the capacity of network content production and dissemination, make the party's claims the strongest voice of the network space, and create a good atmosphere of public opinion to accelerate the construction of modern Hunan.
This information shows that Yang Haodong has served as member of the Standing Committee of the Hunan Provincial Party Committee and Minister of Propaganda Department.
Before adjustment, Yang Haodong served as Secretary of the Lincang Municipal Party Committee in Yunnan Province.
Yang Haodong (Data Map Picture Source: Today Lincang)
According to public resumes, Yang Haodong was born in January 1965 , graduated from Yunnan University in 1986, and worked at the Literary and Art Editorial Department of the Federation of Literary and Art Federation in Yunnan Province and the Yunnan Provincial Party Committee Working Committee.
In 1995, Yang Haodong was transferred to the General Office of the Yunnan Provincial Party Committee , and served as a secretary investigator, secretary of the secretary of the General Office of the Yunnan Provincial Party CommitteeEssence
In 2004, Yang Haodong adjusted across provinces and was transferred to the director (party office) of the General Office of the Guizhou Provincial Party Committee. In 2005, he served as the deputy director of the Guizhou Provincial Department of Commerce.
In 2010, Yang Haodong returned to work in Yunnan to serve as the member of the Standing Committee of Lijiang Municipal Party Committee and Deputy Mayor , and in 2012, he was the deputy secretary of Lijiang Municipal Party Committee.
In December 2014, Yang Haodong was transferred to the Deputy Secretary of the Lincang Municipal Party Committee and acting mayor. In February of the following year, he served as the mayor of Lincang City.
Yang Haodong Resume
Yang Haodong, male, Han nationality, born in January 1965, was born in Dali, Yunnan, joined the work in July 1986, and joined the Communist Party of China in May 1985.
1982.09-1986.07 Study of Chinese Language and Literature, Yunnan University
1986.07-1993.02 Editor of the Literary and Art Editorial Department of the Federation of Literary and Art Federation in Yunnan Province (during this time: 1986.09-1987.07 in Dehong State Ethnic Normal School)
1993.02-1995.06 Deputy Director of the Working Committee of the Provincial Party Committee of Yunnan Provincial Party Committee
1995.06-1997.02 Deputy Director and Chief Student of the Office of the Office of the General Office of the Yunnan Provincial Party Committee
1997.02-1998.08 Deputy Director of the Office of Yunnan Province (Hanging)
1998.08-2000.11 Secretary of the General Office of the Yunnan Provincial Party Committee Office three assistant investigators
2000.11-2001.08 Three investigators of the Secretary of the General Office of the Yunnan Provincial Party Committee
2001.08-2004.02 Secretary of the Secretary of the General Office of the Guizhou Provincial Party Committee (during the period: 2001.09-2004.07, studying a graduate class at Marxist theory and ideological and political education in Yunnan University, obtained a master's degree)
2004.02-2005.09 Director of the Office (Party Office) of the Guizhou Provincial Party Committee (Party Office) (during this: 2004.10-2004.12 Study at the Chinese Youth Class at the Party School of the Guizhou Provincial Party Committee)
2005.09-2010.04 member and deputy director of the Party Group of the Guizhou Provincial Department of Commerce (during the period: 2007.02-2008.02 as deputy director of the Ministry of Commerce's Foreign Investment and Economic Cooperation Department (Hanging))
2010.04-2010.05 Standing Committee Member of Lijiang Municipal Party Committee of Yunnan Province
2010.05-2011.03 The Standing Committee of the Lijiang Municipal Party Committee and Deputy Mayor of the Municipal People's Government of Yunnan Province
2011.03—2012.12, member of the Standing Committee of the Lijiang Municipal Party Committee of Yunnan Province and Executive Deputy Mayor of the Municipal People's Government
2012.12-2014.12 Deputy Secretary of Lijiang Municipal Party Committee of Yunnan Province
2014.12-2015.02 Deputy Secretary of the Lincang Municipal Party Committee of Yunnan Province, Deputy Mayor of the Municipal People's Government, and Mayor of the Municipal Government, Secretary of the Municipal Government Party Group
2015.02—2017.01 Deputy Secretary of the Lincang Municipal Party Committee of Yunnan Province, Mayor of the Municipal People's Government, Secretary of the Municipal Government Party Group
2017.01 -Secretary of the Lincang Municipal Party Committee of Yunnan Province
The current member of the Standing Committee of the Hunan Provincial Party Committee and the Minister of the Propaganda Department